California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB581 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Amended

Bill September 3, 2019
Bill August 13, 2019
Bill April 25, 2019
Bill April 10, 2019
Bill March 28, 2019