California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB583 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill June 19, 2019
Bill April 29, 2019