|
09/28/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 230, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 5.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 5310.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/28/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
July 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2020
|
July 22 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1104.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 599.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|