Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2019 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 806.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | April 9 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |