Assembly | 06/12/2019 | June 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1255.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1104.) (May 16). | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2019 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 650.) (April 10). | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |