California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB595 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill September 3, 2019
Bill May 17, 2019
Bill April 10, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019