|
01/13/2020
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2020
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2869.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3346.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1256.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1104.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 772.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 714.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|