Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1260.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1104.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 842.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|