Assembly | 06/29/2020 | Referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2020 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2020 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3149.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2020 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2020 | Set for hearing January 21. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3099.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2020 | Set for hearing January 15. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |