Assembly | 06/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1105.) (May 16). | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2019 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 769.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |