California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB611 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2019

Amended

Bill June 24, 2019
Bill June 12, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019