Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 715.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |