Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
July 8 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2019
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2019
|
June 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 1258.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 799.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 652.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2019
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|