|
10/03/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 507, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2958.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1004.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 775.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|