|
09/30/2020
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2020
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 2.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 7. Page 5364.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/28/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1002.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 904.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|