08/30/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 212, Statutes of 2019. | |||
08/30/2019 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 08/23/2019 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2019 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2179.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2019 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 2666.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/05/2019 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 07/05/2019 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 4). | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 592.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 553.) (April 2). | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |