|
10/08/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 651, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3258.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2019
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1363.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From consent calendar on motion of Senator Hueso.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 983.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|