Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2567.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2381.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Set for hearing August 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
August 12 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2019
|
Set for hearing August 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2079.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2019
|
Set for hearing July 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
June 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2019
|
Set for hearing June 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
June 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
Set for hearing June 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|