Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 772.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 652.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | April 24 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2019 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and G.O. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |