Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
(Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1155.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 775.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|