10/09/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 706, Statutes of 2019. | |||
10/09/2019 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 09/10/2019 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/03/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2019 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2962.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2019 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2019 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2019 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2019 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1160.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |