|
10/08/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 569, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2531.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2952.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2019
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 961.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 714.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 524.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2019
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|