Senate
|
09/01/2020
|
Ordered to inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Ordered to unfinished business.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
August 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Set for hearing August 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2020
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4420.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2020
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5062.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/28/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2020
|
July 13 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3154.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2020
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3055.) (January 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2020
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2020
|
Set for hearing January 7 in E. & C.A. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|