Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2020 | January 23 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2020 | Set for hearing January 23. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2020 | January 21 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2020 | Set for hearing January 21. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2020 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2020 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3079.) (January 13). | ||
Senate | 01/07/2020 | Set for hearing January 13. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |