|
01/13/2020
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2020
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2019
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2928.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2019
|
Urgency clause adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2019
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 2908.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Set for hearing September 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2808.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 14. Page 3342.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 924.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 771.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|