Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2020 | January 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 12/20/2019 | Set for hearing January 14. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |