California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB706 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2019

Amended

Bill September 3, 2019
Bill July 1, 2019
Bill April 29, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019