Assembly | 06/19/2019 | June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2019 | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 1156.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 800.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 651.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | April 2 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |