|
07/30/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2549.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1004.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 776.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|