California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB738 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Amended

Bill August 12, 2019
Bill June 26, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019