|
09/29/2020
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2020
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 7.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 5415.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2019
|
July 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1156.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 849.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 654.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|