California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB742 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill July 1, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019