Assembly | 08/30/2019 | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2019 | June 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2019 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1179.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 849.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |