Senate | 02/03/2020 | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2019 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Durazo. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1108.) (May 16). | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 797.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |