|
09/29/2020
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2020
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 5290.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
July 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3168.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3142.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2020
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2020
|
January 21 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2020
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3088.) (January 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2020
|
Set for hearing January 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|