Assembly | 07/05/2019 | July 10 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 1244.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1108.) (May 16). | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 843.) (April 24). | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |