Assembly | 06/25/2019 | June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1353.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1109.) (May 16). | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 650.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2019 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |