Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 923.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 801.) (April 24). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 7. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |