|
09/05/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 258, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2241.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2627.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 925.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 847.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|