Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 16. Page 5157.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3738.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2020
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2020
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 3366.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2020
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2020
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2020
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|