|
09/29/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 307, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5416.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/29/2020
|
July 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3839.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3663.) (June 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2020
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3525.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2020
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|