|
09/25/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Ordered to unfinished business.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Grove.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5294.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Gray.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3684.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Set for hearing June 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3525.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2020
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2020
|
March 24 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2020
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|