California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB872 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2020

Amended

Bill August 12, 2020
Bill August 5, 2020
Bill July 27, 2020