|
09/24/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 131, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5282.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
July 27 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3817.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3766.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Set for hearing June 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2020
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2020
|
Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Set for hearing June 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3549.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2020
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2020
|
March 23 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2020
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|