Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2020
|
July 20 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3817.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3766.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Set for hearing June 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2020
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2020
|
Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Set for hearing June 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3524.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2020
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2020
|
March 25 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2020
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|