LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB891
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB891
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB891
Action History
Senate
05/12/2020
Referral to Com. on ED. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Senate
03/16/2020
Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and ED.
Senate
03/02/2020
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
02/06/2020
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
01/29/2020
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
Senate
01/28/2020
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.