|
09/28/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 232, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5279.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3684.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Set for hearing June 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3568.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2020
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2020
|
March 24 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2020
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|