|
09/25/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 4.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 5411.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
July 27 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 3863.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3767.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
June 18 hearing: Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3766.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Set for hearing June 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2020
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3559.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2020
|
Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2020
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2020
|
April 1 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2020
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2020
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|