California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB909 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2020

Amended

Bill July 27, 2020
Bill March 16, 2020