|
09/24/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5279.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3680.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3523.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2020
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2020
|
March 18 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2020
|
Set for hearing March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2020
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|